This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 10/13/2021 at 16:07:19 (UTC).

VAUGHN, ALICIA MICHELLE VS JOHNSON, ARTHUR JAMES II

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 VAUGHN, ALICIA MICHELLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JOHNSON, ARTHUR JAMES II. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, SONNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, SONNY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAUGHN, ALICIA MICHELLE

Respondent

JOHNSON, ARTHUR JAMES II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SAFKER, NICOLE CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons disposition on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) ORDER EXTENDING TEMP ON 10/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent IH scheduled on 11/18/2021 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event IH on 10/12/2021 1100 AM Judge SONNY SCAFF results CONTINUED on 10/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW PETITIONER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGHNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons disposition on 9/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) ORDER EXTENDING TEMP ON 9/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOFFENSE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent IH scheduled on 9/28/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 242021DR000185DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: SCAFF , SONNY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFKER, NICOLE CHRISTINA