This case was last updated from Hamilton County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 12/03/2022 at 15:03:39 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY IN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY IN. This case was filed in Hamilton County - Third Judicial Circuit Court, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

MARSHALL, SABRINA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SABRINA MARS

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY FKA AME

HENRY WALTON BISHOP III INDIVI

DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUGGAR, JASON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/03/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/03/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/03/2022:SUMMONS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

11/03/2022:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

11/03/2022:CERTIFICATE OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED SABRINA MARSHALL

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED SABRINA MARSHALL

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SABRINA MARSHALL ON 11/23/22 AT 1:30PM

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SABRINA MARSHALL ON 11/23/22 AT 1:30PM

RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

11/29/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SABRINA MARSHALL ON 11/23/22 AT 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED SABRINA MARSHALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 54019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $905.00 Receipt Number MX 53927

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $905.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SABRINA MARSHALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY - SABRINA MARSHALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $905.00 Receipt Number MX 53903

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase 242022CA000087CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less