This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 12:00:57 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS THOMAS, TAMARA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS, TAMARA. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, SONNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, SONNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

THOMAS, TAMARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/05/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

02/19/2021:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

COMPLAINT

02/19/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/19/2021 09:15; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 3/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 44713

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/19/2021 at 0915 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTAIL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase 242021SC000023SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J