This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/04/2022 at 15:34:09 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS FLYNN, TERRY R

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLYNN, TERRY R. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

FLYNN, TERRY R

White Springs, FL 32096-2317

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE JESUS, JOHN BACUS

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/03/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ISSUING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONF

02/03/2022:ISSUING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 2/21/22

02/23/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 2/21/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

02/27/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/02/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CON on 3/1/2022 0900 AM Judge SONNY SCAFF results DISPOSED on 3/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/01/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 2/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 2/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 49395

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/1/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000010SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE JESUS , JOHN BACUS