Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Hamilton County on 03/27/2021 at 15:03:01 (UTC).

PHILISTIN, JEFFNEY VS INCH, MARK S

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 PHILISTIN, JEFFNEY filed an Other lawsuit against INCH, MARK S. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Hamilton County, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL S and BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Third Circuit Courts - Hamilton County

  • Courthouse:

    Hamilton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL S

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHILISTIN, JEFFNEY

Respondent

INCH, MARK S

 

Court Documents

LETTER TRANSFERRING CASE TO BROWARD COUNTY CLERK

03/05/2021:LETTER TRANSFERRING CASE TO BROWARD COUNTY CLERK

ORDER TREATING HABEAS PETITION AS A MOTION SEEKING RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 3.800 OR 3.850 AND TRANSFERRING MOTION

03/04/2021:ORDER TREATING HABEAS PETITION AS A MOTION SEEKING RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 3.800 OR 3.850 AND TRANSFERRING MOTION

LETTER TO MR PHILISTIN ADVISING OF CASE NUMBER

02/25/2021:LETTER TO MR PHILISTIN ADVISING OF CASE NUMBER

HABEAS APPENDICES

02/25/2021:HABEAS APPENDICES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF LETTER RECEIVED FROM PETITIONER AND COPY OF LETTER AGAIN TRANSFERRING CASE TO BROWARD COUNTY. A COPY OF THE LETTER TRANSFERRING WAS ALSO SENT TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TRANSFERRING CASE TO BROWARD COUNTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TREATING HABEAS PETITION AS A MOTION SEEKING RELIEF PURSUANT TO RULE 3.800 OR 3.850 AND TRANSFERRING MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO MR PHILISTIN ADVISING OF CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPENDICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY PETTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase 242021CA000008CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S assigned

    Read MoreRead Less