This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 07/09/2019 14:23:47

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/15/2019 a Other case was filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC against LUALLEN, SHIRLEY in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Hamilton County Courts
  • Judge SCAFF, SONNY
  • Courthouse Hamilton County Courthouse
  • County Hamilton
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
  • Represented By
    • OBI, VALERIA I.
  • Defendant LUALLEN, SHIRLEY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS

06/15/2019:SUMMONS

Free with Subscription
COMPLAINT

06/15/2019:COMPLAINT

Free with Subscription
CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/15/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE; DEFENDANT SERVED SUMMONS ON 6/26/19
  • 06/26/2019
  • Active Process Civil Summons disposition on 6/26/2019
  • 06/20/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 36107
  • 06/20/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Active Process Civil Summons
  • 06/17/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00
  • 06/15/2019
  • SUMMONS
  • 06/15/2019
  • COMPLAINT
  • 06/15/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/15/2019
  • Case 242019CC000046CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/15/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.