This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/09/2022 at 14:26:42 (UTC).

MCGAULEY CORPORATION VS HARRIS, DELEAH

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 MCGAULEY CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARRIS, DELEAH. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, SONNY and SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, SONNY

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGAULEY CORPORATION

Defendant

HARRIS, DELEAH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

02/07/2022:COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

NOTICE TO TENANT RENT UNPAID

02/07/2022:NOTICE TO TENANT RENT UNPAID

EVICTION SUMMONS

02/07/2022:EVICTION SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/9/22

02/10/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/9/22

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/15/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/17/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

02/17/2022:MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

WRIT

02/17/2022:WRIT

FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

02/21/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; CERT COPIES GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF

02/22/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; CERT COPIES GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; CERT COPIES GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT-BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 49477

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons disposition on 2/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO TENANT RENT UNPAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCase 242022CC000012CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCGAULEY CORPORATION is a litigant