This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Hamilton County on 10/06/2021 at 15:07:47 (UTC).

MALLIARAKIS, GEORGIOS VS CATHAY BANK

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 MALLIARAKIS, GEORGIOS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CATHAY BANK. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Hamilton County, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALLIARAKIS, GEORGIOS

Defendant

CATHAY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

09/11/2021:THIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE UPON CHANG M LIU

09/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE UPON CHANG M LIU

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

09/07/2021:VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 47707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD JUDICIAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE UPON CHANG M LIU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase 242021CA000043CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CATHAY BANK A CALIFORNIA BANK AND LENDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECKER, ANDREW JOSEPH