This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 02/12/2022 at 15:38:21 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SHEPPARD, SHERRINA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHEPPARD, SHERRINA. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SHEPPARD, SHERRINA

Jasper, FL 32052-6293

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/14/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ISSUING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONF

01/14/2022:ISSUING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONF

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/25/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/01/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 1/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 1/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 49156

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/1/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000002SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL