This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 11/20/2021 at 03:13:36 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS PEREZ, ROSE

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEREZ, ROSE. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PEREZ, ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAIS, CHRISTINE ANN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/19/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/19/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/19/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED- PRETRIAL SET FOR 12/7/21 AT 9AM

10/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED- PRETRIAL SET FOR 12/7/21 AT 9AM

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/28/21

10/29/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/28/21

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/28/21

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/28/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/07/2021 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 48162

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 12/7/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- PRETRIAL SET FOR 12/7/21 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCase 242021SC000112SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAIS , CHRISTINE ANN