This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/12/2022 at 15:35:50 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JONES, AVA

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, AVA. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JONES, AVA

White Springs, FL 32096-1919

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/10/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/10/2022:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/21/22

02/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/21/22

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/21/22

02/25/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/21/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

02/27/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

02/28/2022:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

02/28/2022:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

02/28/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

02/28/2022:DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

02/28/2022:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/01/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE-COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 2/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/1/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000011SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW