This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/19/2022 at 15:35:51 (UTC).

LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, L VS SINGLETARY, JASON LEE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, L filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SINGLETARY, JASON LEE. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, L

Defendant

SINGLETARY, JASON LEE

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/18/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

02/18/2022:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/24/22

02/25/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/24/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/05/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 2/24/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 2/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 49585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 4/5/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000013SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: SCAFF , SONNY assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant