This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/24/2022 at 16:42:00 (UTC).

LAMB, BETTY, WARREN, DOROTHY L Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 LAMB, BETTY, WARREN, DOROTHY L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAMB, BETTY

Decedent

WARREN, DOROTHY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUGAY, SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 49745

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DOROTHY L WARREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT & ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase 242022CP000007CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bugay, Scott R