This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 03/20/2021 at 15:33:35 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS KROHN, CAROLYN A

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KROHN, CAROLYN A. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, SONNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, SONNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

KROHN, CAROLYN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINEN, DREW RICHARD

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

02/19/2021:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

02/19/2021:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

02/19/2021:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT

02/19/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/19/2021 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 44714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/19/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTAIL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase 242021SC000022SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINEN, DREW RICHARD