This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/12/2022 at 16:38:31 (UTC).

JOHNSON, ALBERT, JOHNSON, THERESA ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 JOHNSON, ALBERT, JOHNSON, THERESA ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Decedent

JOHNSON, THERESA ANN

Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON, ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

TOTTY, JEFFREY T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDING & FILING ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 49608

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCase 242022CP000005CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Totty, Jeffrey T