This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/29/2022 at 16:19:37 (UTC).

GRUBBS, SARA M VS GRUBBS, KENNETH J

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 GRUBBS, SARA M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRUBBS, KENNETH J. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN and BRYAN, PAUL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

BRYAN, PAUL S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRUBBS, SARA M

Respondent

GRUBBS, KENNETH J

Not Classified By Court

MORRIS, SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BISHOP, CONRAD C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE -DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BISHOP LAW FIRM FOR RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED KENNETH GRUBBS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO TCSO REGARDING SUMMONS, CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY, AND ALL OTHER COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketINDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketINDIGENCY APPLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED TO TCSO FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase 242022DR000028DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISHOP, CONRAD C