This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 11/02/2021 at 16:06:14 (UTC).

ERVINE, KATRINA D VS ERVINE, ARTHUR GLENN

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 ERVINE, KATRINA D filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ERVINE, ARTHUR GLENN. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ERVINE, KATRINA D

Respondent

ERVINE, ARTHUR GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SAFKER, NICOLE CHRISTINA

Respondent Attorney

BLOW, FELICIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketFIREARMS STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 10/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTICE VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent IH scheduled on 11/2/2021 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCase 242021DR000197DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFKER, NICOLE CHRISTINA