This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 11/18/2021 at 02:56:41 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS WHITE, STANLEY J

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITE, STANLEY J. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WHITE, STANLEY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/15/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED 11/2/21 PRETRIAL CONFRENCE

10/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED 11/2/21 PRETRIAL CONFRENCE

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 10/27/21 (SUBJECT DECEASED AS OF DECEMBER 2020)

10/28/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 10/27/21 (SUBJECT DECEASED AS OF DECEMBER 2020)

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

11/01/2021:NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE

11/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 10/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/02/2021 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 10/27/21 (SUBJECT DECEASED AS OF DECEMBER 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 11/2/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 48126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 11/2/21 PRETRIAL CONFRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase 242021SC000111SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H