This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 15:34:46 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS BRYAN, ROBYN D

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYAN, ROBYN D. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

BRYAN, ROBYN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/25/21

04/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/25/21

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/25/21

04/06/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/25/21

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

03/09/2021:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

ISSUING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONF

03/09/2021:ISSUING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR AT PRE-TRIAL CONF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/09/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/19/2021 09:30; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE TELEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 3/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 45067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 4/19/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS & ORDER REGARDING REMOTE APPEARANCE FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTAIL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase 242021SC000030SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel