This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/04/2022 at 15:34:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS PLESS, BRIAN L

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PLESS, BRIAN L. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR, SCAFF, SONNY and SONNY SCAFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

PLESS, BRIAN L

Jasper, FL 32052-5735

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/02/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/02/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

02/02/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

02/02/2022:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/02/2022:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 2/15/22

02/17/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 2/15/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/01/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED SUMMONS AS OF 2/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 2/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 49382

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/1/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000009SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin