This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 02/19/2022 at 15:33:53 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS BROWN, RICKY J

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN, RICKY J. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, SONNY, SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

BROWN, RICKY J

White Springs, FL 32096-1921

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/20/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

01/20/2022:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

01/20/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

01/20/2022:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 1/27/22

01/27/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 1/27/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/01/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 1/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 1/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 49239

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 3/1/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000005SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin