This case was last updated from Hamilton County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 16:04:47 (UTC).

ARMSTRONG, BRADLEY C VS TEMPLE, JASON DAKOTA

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 ARMSTRONG, BRADLEY C filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TEMPLE, JASON DAKOTA. This case was filed in Hamilton County Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, SONNY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, SONNY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARMSTRONG, BRADLEY C

Respondent

TEMPLE, JASON DAKOTA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) FINAL ON 3/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event IH on 3/18/2021 1130 AM Judge SONNY SCAFF results DISPOSED on 3/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketFIREARMS STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) TEMP ON 3/5/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons disposition on 3/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE; CERT COPIES TAKEN TO HCSO & MAILED TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROTECTION AGAINST REPEAT VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketActive Process Civil Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent IH scheduled on 3/18/2021 at 1130 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase 242021DR000043DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: SCAFF , SONNY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less