This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:56:10 (UTC).

WHITFIELD, MICHAEL, WHITFIELD, SARA J Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 WHITFIELD, MICHAEL, WHITFIELD, SARA J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITFIELD, MICHAEL

Decedent

WHITFIELD, SARA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION IN THE AMT OF $414.28 / COPY MAILED TO ATTY CHARLES COSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION LESS THAN $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $235.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003275

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $235.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 232019CP000078PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY