This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:48:13 (UTC).

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI VS MIKHAIL, CORINNE C Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MIKHAIL, CORINNE C. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI

Defendants

MIKHAIL, DAVID K

MIKHAIL, CORINNE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, JARED

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS PROPOSED FOR DAVID MIKHAIL ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED FOR DAVID MIKHAIL ( E FILED )

SUMMONS PROPOSED FOR CORINNE C MIKHAIL ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED FOR CORINNE C MIKHAIL ( E FILED )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

SUMMONS TO CORINNE MIKHAIL

01/03/2022:SUMMONS TO CORINNE MIKHAIL

SUMMONS TO DAVID MIKHAIL

01/03/2022:SUMMONS TO DAVID MIKHAIL

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/03/2022:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

03/01/2022:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

CLERKS DEFAULT

03/02/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DAVID MAKHAIL SERVED

03/24/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DAVID MAKHAIL SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED CORRINE MIKHAIL NON SERVED

03/24/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED CORRINE MIKHAIL NON SERVED

NOTICE OF ACTION

04/05/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION

04/05/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED CORRINE MIKHAIL NON SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED DAVID MAKHAIL SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED FOR CORINNE C MIKHAIL ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED FOR DAVID MIKHAIL ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000102CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less