This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:47:59 (UTC).

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI VS MALIKOV, VLADIMIR Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MALIKOV, VLADIMIR. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DEVIN COLLIER and COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DEVIN COLLIER

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI

Defendants

MALIKOV, VLADIMIR

NOSAREV, DIMITRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, JARED

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS VLADIMIR MALIKOV PROPOSED ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:SUMMONS VLADIMIR MALIKOV PROPOSED ( E FILED )

SUMMONS DIMITRI NOSAREV ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:SUMMONS DIMITRI NOSAREV ( E FILED )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

SUMMONS TO DIMITRI NOSAREV

01/03/2022:SUMMONS TO DIMITRI NOSAREV

SUMMONS VLADIMIR MALIKOV

01/03/2022:SUMMONS VLADIMIR MALIKOV

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/03/2022:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED

02/25/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED 1.11.22

02/25/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED 1.11.22

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/04/2022:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING MAY 19 2022 AT 315[MET

04/13/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING MAY 19 2022 AT 315[MET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/19/2022 15:15; Judge: COLLIER, DEVIN D; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: ZOOM TELECONFERENCE ZOOM T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING MAY 19 2022 AT 315[MET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEvent MOTION HEARING scheduled on 5/19/2022 at 0315 PM, ZM - Judge DEVIN COLLIER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED 1.11.22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS DIMITRI NOSAREV ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS VLADIMIR MALIKOV PROPOSED ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000104CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less