This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:48:20 (UTC).

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI VS LALOSHI, MORRIS

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LALOSHI, MORRIS. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI

Defendant

LALOSHI, MORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, JARED

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

SUMMONS

01/03/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS TO MORRIS LALOSHI

01/03/2022:SUMMONS TO MORRIS LALOSHI

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/03/2022:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

03/22/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO MORRIS LALOSHI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $415.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003230

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $5.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000101CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/29/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less