****************AXMX
11/16/2021
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Other Real Property
Gulf, Florida
COLLIER, DEVIN D
WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI
ARAFA, RAOUF
UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RAOUF ARAFA
BLOCK, JARED
11/16/2021:COVER SHEET
11/16/2021:SUMMONS
11/16/2021:SUMMONS
11/16/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
11/16/2021:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
11/16/2021:SUMMONS TO RAOUF ARAFA
11/16/2021:SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RAOF ARAFA
12/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RAOF ARAFA - SERVED
12/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED RAOUF ARAFA SERVED
01/17/2022:MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY
01/18/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT
01/18/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT RAOUF ARAFA
01/18/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT
01/19/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT JULIA ARAFA
01/19/2022:ORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY
02/24/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT
DocketCase Status set to CLSD
[-] Read LessDocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT
[-] Read LessDocketORDER ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY
[-] Read LessDocketCLERKS DEFAULT JULIA ARAFA
[-] Read LessDocketCLERKS DEFAULT
[-] Read LessDocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
[-] Read LessDocketCLERKS DEFAULT RAOUF ARAFA
[-] Read LessDocketCLERKS DEFAULT
[-] Read LessDocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY
[-] Read LessDocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002886
[-] Read LessDocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $425.00 Balance Remaining $5.00
[-] Read LessDocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $425.00
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS
[-] Read LessDocketCOVER SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketJudge: Assigned
[-] Read LessDocketCase 232021CA000089CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2021
[-] Read Less