This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:41:08 (UTC).

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI VS ARAFA, JULIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ARAFA, JULIA. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WETAPPO PRESERVE OWNERS ASSOCI

Defendants

ARAFA, RAOUF

ARAFA, JULIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, JARED

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/16/2021:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

11/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/16/2021:SUMMONS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/16/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/16/2021:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS TO RAOUF ARAFA

11/16/2021:SUMMONS TO RAOUF ARAFA

SUMMONS TO JULIA ARAFA

11/16/2021:SUMMONS TO JULIA ARAFA

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED JULIA ARAFA 12 17 2021 500 PM ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED JULIA ARAFA 12 17 2021 500 PM ( E FILED )

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED RAOUF ARAFA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JULIA ARAFA 12 17 2021 500 PM ( E FILED )

12/29/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED RAOUF ARAFA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JULIA ARAFA 12 17 2021 500 PM ( E FILED )

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

01/17/2022:MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

CLERKS DEFAULT

01/18/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT

CLERKS DEFAULT RAOUF ARAFA

01/18/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT RAOUF ARAFA

CLERKS DEFAULT

01/18/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT

CLERKS DEFAULT JULIA ARAFA

01/19/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT JULIA ARAFA

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

02/24/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT JULIA ARAFA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT RAOUF ARAFA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED RAOUF ARAFA SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JULIA ARAFA 12 17 2021 500 PM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $425.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002887

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $425.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $425.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000090CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less