This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 05:47:39 (UTC).

WEAVER, DEREK SHANE VS WEAVER, KRYMSON BLAKE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 WEAVER, DEREK SHANE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WEAVER, KRYMSON BLAKE. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLIER, DEVIN D and SHANNON LORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLIER, DEVIN D

SHANNON LORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEAVER, DEREK SHANE

Respondent

WEAVER, KRYMSON BLAKE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DIRECT PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF FILING NOTICE TO PAYOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO PAYOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketLETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING DECEMBER 27 2021 AT 1115AMET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent MOTION HEARING scheduled on 12/27/2021 at 1115 AM, MX - Judge SHANNON LORD presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATIONS OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000668

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase 232021DR000031DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less