Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Gulf County on 03/24/2021 at 16:02:46 (UTC).

WATTS, PATRICIA VS GULF COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY CO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 WATTS, PATRICIA filed an Other lawsuit against GULF COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY CO. This case was filed in Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Gulf County, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourteenth Circuit Courts - Gulf County

  • Courthouse:

    Gulf County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATTS, PATRICIA

Defendant

GULF COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDEN, CHRISTOPHER LEE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

02/26/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS (EXECUTED)

03/04/2021:SUMMONS (EXECUTED)

SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

03/04/2021:SUMMONS (PROPOSED)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/26/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS

02/26/2021:SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/26/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/26/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/26/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

COVER SHEET

02/26/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (EXECUTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000011CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADDEN, CHRISTOPHER LEE