This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 06:39:49 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS FLEMING, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLEMING, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and TIMOTHY MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

FLEMING, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, CARLA T

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

03/24/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

03/24/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

SUMMONS 05 06 2021 915 AM ET ( E FILED )

03/25/2021:SUMMONS 05 06 2021 915 AM ET ( E FILED )

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE FOR MATTHEW FLEMING BY SERVING MOTHER TAMMY LISTER 04 13 2021 950 AM ( E FILED )

04/13/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE FOR MATTHEW FLEMING BY SERVING MOTHER TAMMY LISTER 04 13 2021 950 AM ( E FILED )

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ( E FILED )

05/06/2021:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ( E FILED )

ORDER (UNRECORDED) ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( E FILED )

05/06/2021:ORDER (UNRECORDED) ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( E FILED )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCASE MINUTES 05062021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/06/2021 09:15; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (UNRECORDED) ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE FOR MATTHEW FLEMING BY SERVING MOTHER TAMMY LISTER 04 13 2021 950 AM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 05 06 2021 915 AM ET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 5/6/2021 at 0915 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000704

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase 232021SC000034SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE ESQ, CARLA T