This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/29/2021 at 15:33:28 (UTC).

THE ST JOE COMPANY VS JIM ZINGALE AS EXECUTIVE DIREC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 THE ST JOE COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JIM ZINGALE AS EXECUTIVE DIREC. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ST JOE COMPANY

Defendants

MITCH BURKE AS PROPERTY APPRAI

SHIRLEY JENKINS AS TAX COLLECT

JIM ZINGALE AS EXECUTIVE DIREC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, H FRENCH

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS, TIMOTHY E.

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/30/2021:COVER SHEET

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/01/2021:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

COMPLAINT

11/30/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

12/15/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

12/15/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

12/15/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS TO JIM ZINGALE

12/16/2021:SUMMONS TO JIM ZINGALE

SUMMONS TO SHIRLEY JENKINS

12/16/2021:SUMMONS TO SHIRLEY JENKINS

SUMMONS TO MITCH BURKE

12/16/2021:SUMMONS TO MITCH BURKE

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

12/17/2021:ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHIRLEY JENKINS SERVED

12/28/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHIRLEY JENKINS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MITCH BURKE SERVED

12/28/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MITCH BURKE SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/28/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MITCH BURKE SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SHIRLEY JENKINS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO MITCH BURKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SHIRLEY JENKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO JIM ZINGALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $30.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003163

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $30.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002996

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000093CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, H FRENCH