This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:56:56 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR VS FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J, TIMOTHY MCFARLAND and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUAREZ, MARIANA

Defendant Attorney

ZIMMERN, BENJAMIN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTAION TO SUPPORT MOTION TO DISMISS - (E FILED)

04/06/2020:NOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTAION TO SUPPORT MOTION TO DISMISS - (E FILED)

RESPONSE BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

03/27/2020:RESPONSE BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ( E FILED)

02/24/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ( E FILED)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND SECOND SET OF ROGS ( E FILED)

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND SECOND SET OF ROGS ( E FILED)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT ( E FILED)

02/18/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT ( E FILED)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND SECONDT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( E FILED)

02/18/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND SECONDT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( E FILED)

NOTICE OF HEARING PRETRIAL SCHEDULED ON 2/6/2020 AT 11AMET (EXECUTED)

12/09/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING PRETRIAL SCHEDULED ON 2/6/2020 AT 11AMET (EXECUTED)

SUMMONS (PROPOSED) (E FILED)

12/09/2019:SUMMONS (PROPOSED) (E FILED)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT (E FILED)

12/09/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT (E FILED)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/12/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTAION TO SUPPORT MOTION TO DISMISS - (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/02/2020 09:30; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126; Defendant Attorney: ZIMMERN, BENJAMIN JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketEvent MOTION HEARING scheduled on 4/2/2020 at 0930 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND SECOND SET OF ROGS ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT FEDNAT AND SECONDT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE TRIAL HEARING on 2/6/2020 1100 AM Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND results CONTINUED on 2/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (EFILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(b)(1)(A) (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM TO ROBERT GONZALEZ ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $300.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase 232019SC000213SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kidwell Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suarez, Mariana, ESQ