This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:25:42 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS BAY MEDICAL CENTER Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAY MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM P TH

THURSDAY, TERESA A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA A THU

TENANT I UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT II UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT III UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT IV UNKNOWN TENANT

BAY MEDICAL CENTER

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

GULF COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

CITY OF PORT ST JOE

THURSBAY, WILLIAM P

Not Classified By Court

THURSDAY, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASSEL, GARY IRA

 

Court Documents

CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

03/24/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

03/22/2022:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/02/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE

REPLY TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER

03/01/2022:REPLY TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER

SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/23/2022:SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

02/22/2022:SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/22/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER (RECORDED) GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/22/2022:ORDER (RECORDED) GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

02/16/2022:MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

CLERKS DEFAULT CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO TERESA THURSBAY

11/29/2021:CLERKS DEFAULT CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO TERESA THURSBAY

CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO GULF COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

11/22/2021:CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO GULF COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO BAY MEDICAL CENTER

11/22/2021:CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO BAY MEDICAL CENTER

CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

11/22/2021:CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO WILLIAM THURSBAY

11/22/2021:CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO WILLIAM THURSBAY

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

11/22/2021:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

11/22/2021:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

11/22/2021:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

11/22/2021:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT AS TO PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO DEFENDANTS ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000407

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000077CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST JOE is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where GULF COUNTY CLERK is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant