This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/08/2022 at 15:37:23 (UTC).

SEYMOUR, SCOTT VS GULF PLACE DEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 SEYMOUR, SCOTT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GULF PLACE DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEYMOUR, SCOTT

Defendant

GULF PLACE DEVELOPMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAY, ETHAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/02/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/02/2022:COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S)

12/02/2022:EXHIBIT(S)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS

12/04/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS TO GULF PLACE DEVELOPMENT LLC

12/05/2022:SUMMONS TO GULF PLACE DEVELOPMENT LLC

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/07/2022:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO GULF PLACE DEVELOPMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022003111

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022003106

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 232022CA000092CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETHAN ANDREW WAY