This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:56:42 (UTC).

SANDOVAL, YESICA DEL CARMEN VS ALDANA, JOSE

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 SANDOVAL, YESICA DEL CARMEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALDANA, JOSE. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GAY, SHONNA YOUNG and SHONNA GAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

SHONNA GAY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDOVAL, YESICA DEL CARMEN

Respondent

ALDANA, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOYETTE, ROBERT FOSTER

Respondent Attorney

MCCAHILL, CLINTON THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TRANSLATION (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR PAYMENT FROM JOSE ALDANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MX 2020002011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION ON SEPTEMBER 9 2020 AT 900AMCST VIA ZOOM (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS WITH COPY OF DL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATIONS OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD (REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 232019DR000154DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINTON MCCAHILL