This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/16/2020 at 12:32:34 (UTC).

QUICKEN LOANS INC VS ERIC LANGSTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 QUICKEN LOANS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ERIC LANGSTON. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUICKEN LOANS INC

Defendants

ERIC LANGSTON

ERIC LANGSTON AS PERSONAL REPR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET - (E FILED)

02/28/2020:COVER SHEET - (E FILED)

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM /CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT - (E FILED)

02/28/2020:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM /CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT - (E FILED)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - (E FILED)

02/28/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - (E FILED)

(PROPOSED) - ERIC LANGSTON - (E FILED)

02/28/2020:(PROPOSED) - ERIC LANGSTON - (E FILED)

(PROPOSED) TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (E FILED)

02/28/2020:(PROPOSED) TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (E FILED)

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON - (Executed / E Filed)

02/28/2020:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON - (Executed / E Filed)

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (Executed / E Filed)

02/28/2020:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (Executed / E Filed)

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 3/10/2020 ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REP OF THE ESTATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT - (E FILED)

03/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 3/10/2020 ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REP OF THE ESTATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT - (E FILED)

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 3/10/2020 to ERIC LANGSTON - (E FILED)

03/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 3/10/2020 to ERIC LANGSTON - (E FILED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS - for ERIC LANGSTON / ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 3/10/2020 to ERIC LANGSTON - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 3/10/2020 ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REP OF THE ESTATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (Executed / E Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON - (Executed / E Filed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSent email for payment of Lis Pendens fee to efile@rasflaw.com & mail@rasflaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2020000523

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(PROPOSED) TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - ERIC LANGSTON, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTAATE OF GLORIA LAMAR GANT A/K/A GLORIA L. GANT DECEASED - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(PROPOSED) - ERIC LANGSTON - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE, AND RESTABLISHMENT OF PROMISSORY NOTE - STAMPED CANCELLED - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM /CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase 232020CA000038CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quicken Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan