This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:39:00 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO VS DECOURSEY, STACY LEANN

Case Summary

On 12/04/2021 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DECOURSEY, STACY LEANN. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLIER, DEVIN D and GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLIER, DEVIN D

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Defendant

DECOURSEY, STACY LEANN

Not Classified By Court

DESALVO, STACY LEANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREITNER, JORDAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/04/2021:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

12/04/2021:SUMMONS

TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS

12/08/2021:TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS

ORDER

12/14/2021:ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED STACY DECOURSEY SERVED

12/28/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED STACY DECOURSEY SERVED

RESPONSE BY STACY LEANN DECOURSEY

01/03/2022:RESPONSE BY STACY LEANN DECOURSEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE BY STACY LEANN DECOURSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED STACY DECOURSEY SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTWENTY DAYS SUMMONS TO STACY LEANN DECOURSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003044

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000096CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/4/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Breitner, Jordan