This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 06:00:57 (UTC).

PETERSON, WALTER VS KELLY, TERRY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 PETERSON, WALTER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KELLY, TERRY. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J, TIMOTHY MCFARLAND and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERSON, WALTER

Defendant

KELLY, TERRY

Not Classified By Court

WELCH, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ( EXECUTED)

01/07/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION ( EXECUTED)

FINAL JUDGMENT- EVICTION

12/17/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT- EVICTION

NOTICE OF HEARING- EVICTION

12/17/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING- EVICTION

EVICTION COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

11/25/2019:EVICTION COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

EVICTION SUMMONS- SENT TO SHERRIFF FOR SERVICE

11/26/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS- SENT TO SHERRIFF FOR SERVICE

EVICTION COMPLAINT

11/25/2019:EVICTION COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ( EXECUTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketUpdated Event EVICTION on 12/17/2019 0930 AM Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND results COURT DISPOSED on 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketORDER AMENDED STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT-EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/17/2019 09:30; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: EVICTION; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT- EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMOTION- FOR REHEARING OR RECONSIDERATION ON EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketEvent EVICTION scheduled on 12/17/2019 at 0930 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING- EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS- SENT TO SHERRIFF FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003444

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase 232019CC000221CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge: MCFARLAND , TIMOTHY J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY