This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 20:29:13 (UTC).

NEWREZ VS WYNN, MARY EVELYN Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 NEWREZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WYNN, MARY EVELYN. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GAY, SHONNA YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ

Defendants

WYNN, MARY EVELYN

WYNN, THOMAS WILLIAM JR

Not Classified By Court

CRUZ WYNN, MARY E

JR, TOM WYNN

Not Yet Classified

KONICK, MELISSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

10/06/2021:COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

10/06/2021:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/06/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS

10/06/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/06/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/06/2021:SUMMONS

COPY OF STANDING CIVIL MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/15/2021:COPY OF STANDING CIVIL MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MARY WYNN SERVED NOVEMBER 3 2021

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MARY WYNN SERVED NOVEMBER 3 2021

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED THOMAS WYNN SERVED NOVEMBER 3 2021

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED THOMAS WYNN SERVED NOVEMBER 3 2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED THOMAS WYNN SERVED NOVEMBER 3 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED MARY WYNN SERVED NOVEMBER 3 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING CIVIL MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $1,125.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002554

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $905.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 4 Total Assessed $191.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $191.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000080CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan