This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:59:45 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS FLOYD, BRENDA

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLOYD, BRENDA. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY MCFARLAND, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

FLOYD, BRENDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

02/24/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

(EXECUTED) NOTICE OF HEARING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT FOR PRETRIAL ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 940 AMET

11/15/2019:(EXECUTED) NOTICE OF HEARING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT FOR PRETRIAL ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 940 AMET

(PROPOSED) SUMMONS (EFILED)

11/15/2019:(PROPOSED) SUMMONS (EFILED)

COVER SHEET

11/15/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM (EFILED)

11/15/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM (EFILED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/06/2020 09:40; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE TRIAL HEARING on 2/6/2020 0940 AM Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND results CONTINUED on 2/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DEFENDANT NOT FOUND 12/02/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(EXECUTED) NOTICE OF HEARING SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATE OF FLORIDA-NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT FOR PRETRIAL ON FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 940 AMET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 2/6/2020 at 0940 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(PROPOSED) SUMMONS (EFILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM (EFILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase 232019SC000216SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI