This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:57:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ARRINGTON, JOHNNY C

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARRINGTON, JOHNNY C. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY MCFARLAND, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ARRINGTON, JOHNNY C

Port Saint Joe, FL 32456

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:20 AMET (EXECUTED) (E FILED)

11/21/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:20 AMET (EXECUTED) (E FILED)

COVER SHEET CIVIL FOR MONETARY RELIEF (E FILED)

11/21/2019:COVER SHEET CIVIL FOR MONETARY RELIEF (E FILED)

SUMMONS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT (PROPOSED) NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL (E FILED)

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT (PROPOSED) NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL (E FILED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE TRIAL HEARING on 2/6/2020 1020 AM Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND results COURT DISPOSED on 2/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCASE MINUTES FROM FEBRUARY 6, 2020 PRETRIAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/06/2020 10:20; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE JOHNNY ARRINGTON SERVED ON 12/16/2019 ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:20 AMET (EXECUTED) (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 2/6/2020 at 1020 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET CIVIL FOR MONETARY RELIEF (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT (PROPOSED) NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE TRIAL (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase 232019SC000220SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B