This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 09/17/2020 at 11:56:31 (UTC).

MARPOE, CHARLOTTE M, MARPOE, ROLAND Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 MARPOE, CHARLOTTE M, MARPOE, ROLAND was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GAY, SHONNA YOUNG and SHONNA GAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

SHONNA GAY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARPOE, ROLAND

Not Classified By Court

WEBB, MARK WILLIAM

WEBB, FRANCE ALLEN

WEBB, LLOYD DEAN

WEBB, STEPHEN M

WEBB, RODNEY LEE

Decedent

MARPOE, CHARLOTTE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER AMENDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION APPOINTING ROLAND W MARPOE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR IN THE MIDDLE INITIAL OF THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF CLAIM NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM FROM STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketBOND-SURETY FOR ROLAND WILLIS MARPOE BY THE RLI INSURANCE COMPANY IN THE AMT OF $50000.00 BOND # LSM0994153 SIGNED BY ROLAND MARPOE AND APPROVED BY DEPUTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND IN THE SUM OF $50,000 TO THE GOVERNOR OF FLORIDA AND HIS SUCCESSORS IN OFFICE (E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND # LSM0994153 IN THE AMT OF $50000.00 WITH THE SIGNATURE NOTED/ DUE TO FILING E MAILED HAS REQUESTED THE ORIGINAL FROM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $8.50 Receipt Number MX 2020001022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $8.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PR & NOTICE OF INTEREST IN ESTATE SIGNED BY FRANCIS ALLEN WEBB JR ( E FILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketOTHER OBJECTION TO FORMAL NOTICE AND OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( INTESTATE) E FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION IN THE AMT OF $5412.38 / COPY MAILED TO ATTY COSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION E FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase 232019CP000081PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY