This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 11/20/2021 at 01:25:24 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ROUQUETTE, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROUQUETTE, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J and TIMOTHY MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROUQUETTE, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

10/19/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

10/19/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

SUMMONS 12 02 2021 930 AM ET ( E FILED )

10/20/2021:SUMMONS 12 02 2021 930 AM ET ( E FILED )

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

10/19/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 11.08.21

11/12/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 11.08.21

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/02/2021 09:30; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 11.08.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 12 02 2021 930 AM ET ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 12/2/2021 at 0930 AM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FI ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCase 232021SC000160SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B