This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 06:41:21 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ODOM, DONNA

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ODOM, DONNA. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY MCFARLAND, MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES and MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TIMOTHY MCFARLAND

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES

MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ODOM, DONNA

Port Saint Joe, FL 32456-5175

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

03/08/2021:COVER SHEET ( E FILED )

SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

03/08/2021:SUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

NOTICE TO APPEAR 04 08 2021 230 PM ET ( E FILED )

03/08/2021:NOTICE TO APPEAR 04 08 2021 230 PM ET ( E FILED )

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

03/08/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

RETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED RAN OUT OF TIME TO COMPLETE DILIGENT ATTEMPTS IN ORDER TO RESOLVE SERVICE AT THIS ADDRESS ( E FILED )

04/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED RAN OUT OF TIME TO COMPLETE DILIGENT ATTEMPTS IN ORDER TO RESOLVE SERVICE AT THIS ADDRESS ( E FILED )

CASE MINUTES 04 08 2021

04/09/2021:CASE MINUTES 04 08 2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MINUTES 04 08 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/08/2021 14:30; Judge: MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY J; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/OTHER RM 126

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNSERVED RAN OUT OF TIME TO COMPLETE DILIGENT ATTEMPTS IN ORDER TO RESOLVE SERVICE AT THIS ADDRESS ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR 04 08 2021 230 PM ET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL HEARING scheduled on 4/8/2021 at 0230 PM, XX - Judge TIMOTHY MCFARLAND presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000541

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET ( E FILED )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase 232021SC000025SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL