This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 19:04:47 (UTC).

KNOWLES, ROBERT F III, ROBERT, KNOWLES F JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 KNOWLES, ROBERT F III, ROBERT, KNOWLES F JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KNOWLES, ROBERT F III

Decedent

ROBERT, KNOWLES F JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT NOT RECORDED ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PR & DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACC ROBERT F KNOWLES III ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE RESIDENT ( E FILED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase 232022CP000033PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTIN, CHARLES ANTHONY