This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 05:47:46 (UTC).

HELSON, AMANDA NICHOLE VS ADKISON, SAMUAL ADAM

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 HELSON, AMANDA NICHOLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ADKISON, SAMUAL ADAM. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KNOWLES, AMANDA NICHOLE

Respondent

ADKISON, SAMUAL ADAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000394

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $120.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $120.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $120.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000393

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $120.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $120.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to OPEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $300.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000635

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase 232021DR000030DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less