This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 14:55:26 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS STEVENS, DEBRA K Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STEVENS, DEBRA K. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GAY, SHONNA YOUNG, LORD, SHANNON, SHONNA GAY and SHANNON LORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GAY, SHONNA YOUNG

LORD, SHANNON

SHONNA GAY

SHANNON LORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 3

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 2

STEVENS, DEBRA K

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

Not Classified By Court

HENSON, DEBRA KAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOLARO, TIMOTHY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

EXCEPTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT

11/12/2021:EXCEPTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT

REPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON NON JURY TRIAL

11/02/2021:REPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL

09/24/2021:NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE

02/09/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 06, 2020 - (E FILED)

04/02/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 06, 2020 - (E FILED)

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 6, 2020 @ 1:10 PM

03/31/2020:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 6, 2020 @ 1:10 PM

NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL AMENDED TRIAL DATE ON APRIL 6, 2020 AT 1:10PMET

03/27/2020:NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL AMENDED TRIAL DATE ON APRIL 6, 2020 AT 1:10PMET

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL - (E FILED)

03/18/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL - (E FILED)

NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL DATE - APRIL 6, 2020 @ 13:10PM EST - (E FILED)

02/27/2020:NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL DATE - APRIL 6, 2020 @ 13:10PM EST - (E FILED)

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 27, 2020 - (E FILED)

02/25/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 27, 2020 - (E FILED)

NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 27, 2020 @ 11:45AM EST - (E FILED)

01/16/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 27, 2020 @ 11:45AM EST - (E FILED)

NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 27, 2020 @ 11:45AM EST - (E FILED)

01/16/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 27, 2020 @ 11:45AM EST - (E FILED)

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL - (E FILED)

12/31/2019:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL - (E FILED)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT - DEBRA K STEVENS A/K/A DEBRA KAY HENSON - (Executed / E Filed)

12/17/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT - DEBRA K STEVENS A/K/A DEBRA KAY HENSON - (Executed / E Filed)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ENTRY OF DEFAULT - DEBRA K STEVENS A/K/A DEBRA KAY HENSON - (E FILED)

12/17/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ENTRY OF DEFAULT - DEBRA K STEVENS A/K/A DEBRA KAY HENSON - (E FILED)

AFFIDAVIT OF TIME , EFFORT, AND COSTS - (E FILED)

11/20/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF TIME , EFFORT, AND COSTS - (E FILED)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3 - (E FILED)

11/20/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3 - (E FILED)

NOTICE OF FILING -ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE - (US MAIL)

11/13/2019:NOTICE OF FILING -ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE - (US MAIL)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXCEPTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/01/2021 10:15; Judge: GAY, SHONNA YOUNG; Docket Type: BENCH/JUDGE TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE/COURTROOM 2ND FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent BENCH/JUDGE TRIAL scheduled on 11/1/2021 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge SHONNA GAY presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketWITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $930.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $930.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(PROPOSED) TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(PROPOSED) TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS - DEBRA K. STEVENS a/k/a DEBRA KAY HENSON - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA - (E - FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET - REAL PROPERTY / MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - (E FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCase 232019CA000060CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Freedom Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOLARO, TIMOTHY