This case was last updated from Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/21/2022 at 07:39:16 (UTC).

FOFANOV, ANTON VS MARSHALL, ANNIE MAE

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 FOFANOV, ANTON filed an Other lawsuit against MARSHALL, ANNIE MAE. This case was filed in Gulf County - Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLIER, DEVIN D and DEVIN COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLIER, DEVIN D

DEVIN COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOFANOV, ANTON

Defendant

MARSHALL, ANNIE MAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUDSTILL, CLAYTON BOWERS

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/01/2021:COVER SHEET

ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/02/2021:ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF ACTION

12/06/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION

12/06/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION

ORDER

12/14/2021:ORDER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/31/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERKS DEFAULT

02/01/2022:CLERKS DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/16/2022:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

02/16/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 31 2022 AT 1045AM

03/23/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 31 2022 AT 1045AM

ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/31/2022:ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/31/2022 10:45; Judge: COLLIER, DEVIN D; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: ZOOM TELECONFERENCE ZOOM T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 31 2022 AT 1045AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEvent MOTION HEARING scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 1045 AM, ZM - Judge DEVIN COLLIER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION SIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase 232021CA000095CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STUDSTILL, CLAYTON BOWERS