This case was last updated from Gulf County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 05:46:53 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Et Al VS PITTS, BLAINE A

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against PITTS, BLAINE A. This case was filed in Gulf County Courts, Gulf County Courthouse located in Gulf, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GRANT SPITZER and COLLIER, DEVIN D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Gulf, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GRANT SPITZER

COLLIER, DEVIN D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

KNOWLES, SANDRA J

Defendant

PITTS, BLAINE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM, SHEREE DENISE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketORDER RECOMMENDED ORDER TO ABATE SUSPEND SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAUDIT AND PAYMENT HISTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRETURN MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 2/18/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge GRANT SPITZER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAUDIT AND PAYMENT HISTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FEBRUARY 18 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE CHILD SUPPORT AND AFFIDAVIT FOR NON ENFORCEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE BLAINE PITTS SERVED 4.7.21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketTWENTY DAYS SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 232021DR000041DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM, SHEREE DENISE